Secret Army, a series created by Gerard Glaister, chronicled the history of a Belgian resistance movement during the Second World War dedicated to returning Allied airmen back to their home country. The show was set in a Brussels café and later restaurant (Le Candide), where the owner Albert Foiret helps Lisa Colbert (code-named "Yvette") hide airmen and control the various members of the "Lifeline" organisation as they take the airmen across borders to safer neutral countries such as Spain. Their principal opponents were Ludwig Kessler, an officious officer in the SS, and the more laidback Luftwaffe officer Major Erwin Brandt.
Season | From | To | Episodes |
---|---|---|---|
All Seasons | |||
Specials | 2 | ||
Season 1 | September 1977 | December 1977 | 16 |
Season 2 | September 1978 | December 1978 | 13 |
Season 3 | September 1979 | December 1979 | 14 |
Unassigned Episodes | 0 |
Season | From | To | Episodes |
---|---|---|---|
Season 3 | 1 | ||
Unassigned Episodes | 44 |
Season | From | To | Episodes |
---|---|---|---|
Season 1 | 0 | ||
Unassigned Episodes | 45 |
Name | Number of Episodes | Dates | |
---|---|---|---|
John Brason | 40 | 09/07/1977 - 12/15/1979 | |
N.J. Crisp | 8 | 10/19/1977 - 10/06/1979 | |
Robert Barr | 4 | 11/02/1977 - 10/27/1979 | |
James Andrew Hall | 3 | 10/05/1977 - 11/01/1978 | |
Willis Hall | 3 | 09/07/1977 - 11/23/1977 | |
Eric Paice | 2 | 11/17/1979 - 12/01/1979 | |
David Crane | 2 | 10/25/1978 - 11/22/1978 | |
Simon Masters | 1 | 11/09/1977 | |
Frank Radcliffe | 1 | 11/03/1979 | |
Viktors Ritelis` | 1 | ||
Michael Chapman | 1 | 11/30/1977 | |
Lloyd Humphreys | 1 | 09/29/1979 | |
Gerard Gleister | 1 | 12/22/1979 | |
Allan Prior | 1 | 10/13/1979 | |
Arden Winch | 1 | 09/28/1977 | |
James Cadman | 1 | 12/08/1979 |
Name | Number of Episodes | Dates | |
---|---|---|---|
Viktor Ritelis | 10 | 09/14/1977 - 12/01/1979 | |
Paul Annett | 8 | 09/21/1977 - 11/08/1978 | |
Michael E. Briant | 6 | 11/15/1978 - 11/24/1979 | |
Kenneth Ives | 5 | 09/07/1977 - 12/21/1977 | |
Gerard Glaister | 4 | 12/13/1978 - 12/15/1979 | |
Terence Dudley | 4 | 09/27/1978 - 11/29/1978 | |
Tristan DeVere Cole | 3 | 10/13/1979 - 11/17/1979 | |
Roger Cheveley | 2 | 10/06/1979 - 12/15/1979 | |
Roger Jenkins | 2 | 11/01/1978 - 12/06/1978 | |
Andrew Morgan | 1 | 12/08/1979 | |
Viktors Ritelis | 1 | 09/07/1977 | |
Michael Briant | 1 | 11/03/1979 |
No lists.
No lists.
No lists.
Please log in to view notes.